+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date: May 23, 2013.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 19.
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 4/24/2013.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular).
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
- Prefiled.
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2013: Senate Vote on HB 246, FINAL PASSAGE (#445)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
April 24, 2013: House Vote on HB 246, FINAL PASSAGE (#117)
- Yeas: 90
- Absent: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor