+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2021.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 263.
On June 11, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2021.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably (10-0).
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
June 8, 2021: House Vote on HB 242, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1099)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 9
June 7, 2021: Senate Vote on HB 242, FINAL PASSAGE (#878)
- Yeas: 38
May 13, 2021: House Vote on HB 242, FINAL PASSAGE (#444)
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 12