+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2016.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 52, nays 36. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2016.
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (12-0).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
May 9, 2016: House Vote on HB 235, FINAL PASSAGE (#675)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 36
- Absent: 16
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor