+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 11, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date: 06/11/2021.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 188.
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2021.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably (9-0).
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
- Prefiled.
+ − Votes (2)
May 26, 2021: Senate Vote on HB 234, FINAL PASSAGE (#499)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 2
April 27, 2021: House Vote on HB 234, FINAL PASSAGE (#99)
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 13