+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2015.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 382.
On June 12, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/10/2015.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2015.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report received.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
On June 7, 2015 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On June 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, LaFleur, and Chabert.
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 84, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Adams, Arnold, and Leopold.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2015.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/12/2015.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (14-0).
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (5)
June 10, 2015: House Vote on HB 233, ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1028)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 9
June 10, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 233, ADOPT (#1047)
- Yeas: 31
- Absent: 8
June 4, 2015: House Vote on HB 233, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#755)
- Yeas: 84
- Absent: 21
May 28, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 233, FINAL PASSAGE (#611)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
May 12, 2015: House Vote on HB 233, FINAL PASSAGE (#292)
- Yeas: 87
- Absent: 18
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor