+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date: 06/26/17.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 408.
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Notice Senate recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
- Called from the calendar.
- The House recommitted the bill to Conference Committee.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2017.
- Notice House recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays.
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Senate recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/08/17.
- Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Peterson, Riser, and Walsworth.
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
- Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Thibaut, Danahay, and Chad Brown.
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17.
On June 4, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 20 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/17.
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (8-0).
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (5)
June 8, 2017: House Vote on HB 231, MOTION TO ADOPT (#948)
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 11
June 8, 2017: Senate Vote on HB 231, ADOPT (#963)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
June 6, 2017: House Vote on HB 231, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#825)
- Yeas: 100
- Absent: 5
June 2, 2017: Senate Vote on HB 231, FINAL PASSAGE (#731)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 7
May 10, 2017: House Vote on HB 231, FINAL PASSAGE (#262)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor