+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 543.
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2016.
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 9 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/20/2016.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (13-0).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
June 2, 2016: House Vote on HB 223, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1193)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
May 24, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 223, FINAL PASSAGE (#991)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 3
April 20, 2016: House Vote on HB 223, FINAL PASSAGE (#404)
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor