+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date: June 30, 2015.
- Effective date: June 30, 2015.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 381.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On June 7, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/12/2015.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably (16-0).
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
June 9, 2015: House Vote on HB 223, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#919)
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 14
June 3, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 223, FINAL PASSAGE (#698)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
May 12, 2015: House Vote on HB 223, FINAL PASSAGE (#290)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor