+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2021.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 260.
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 7 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2021.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2021.
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably (14-0).
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
June 7, 2021: Senate Vote on HB 220, AMENDMENT # 3563 BY MORRIS, HB 220 BY MILLER, G. (#891)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 1
June 7, 2021: Senate Vote on HB 220, FINAL PASSAGE (#892)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 2
May 18, 2021: House Vote on HB 220, FINAL PASSAGE (#522)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor