+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Schroder, Simon, and Pearson.
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Heitmeier, Mills, and Donahue.
- Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2014.
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/2014.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
- Reported with amendments (9-5).
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/21/2014.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
May 29, 2014: House Vote on HB 216, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1357)
- Yeas: 87
- Absent: 17
May 27, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 216, FINAL PASSAGE (#1411)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
April 23, 2014: House Vote on HB 216, FINAL PASSAGE (#551)
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 12
April 23, 2014: House Vote on HB 216, FINAL PASSAGE (#551)
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor