+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date: 07/01/2019.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 102.
On June 2, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 05/29/19.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/19.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably (17-0).
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2019: House Vote on HB 209, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#645)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
May 21, 2019: Senate Vote on HB 209, FINAL PASSAGE (#428)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
April 23, 2019: House Vote on HB 209, FINAL PASSAGE (#38)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor