+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 299.
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 20 yeas and 9 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
- Called from the Calendar.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
- Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 19 yeas and 13 nays.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 57, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/20/18.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (8-0).
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
- Prefiled.
+ − Votes (3)
May 10, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 206, FINAL PASSAGE (#994)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 10
April 19, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 206, FINAL PASSAGE (#468)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 7
March 20, 2018: House Vote on HB 206, FINAL PASSAGE (#61)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 30
- Absent: 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor