+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/31/2014.
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably (15-0).
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/21/2014.
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
- Prefiled.
+ − Vote
March 31, 2014: House Vote on HB 202, FINAL PASSAGE (#139)
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor