+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 26, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
- Called from the calendar.
On May 22, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/20.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
- Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (20-0).
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Rules suspended.
- Reported with amendments (15-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor