+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date: June 19, 2015.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 26.
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
- Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 87, nays 11. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays.
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House on June 15, 2015.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/15/2015.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
- House conferees appointed: Robideaux, Kleckley, and Leger.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Riser, Adley, and Alario.
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
- Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
- Called from the calendar.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
- Notice given.
- Scheduled for concurrence on 6/10/2015.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 2 for 6/8/15.
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
- Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Made Special Order of the day No. 1 for 5/28/2015.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
- Rules suspended.
- Reported favorably (17-0).
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Reported with amendments (16-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title.
+ − Amendments (15)
+ − Votes (13)
June 11, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 2, ADOPT (#1130)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
June 11, 2015: House Vote on HB 2, ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1127)
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 7
June 10, 2015: House Vote on HB 2, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1022)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 10
June 8, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 2, AMENDMENT # 3623 BY CLAITOR, HB 2 BY ROBIDEAUX (#926)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 22
- Absent: 7
June 8, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 2, FINAL PASSAGE (#927)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
May 28, 2015: House Vote on HB 2, AMENDMENT # 3932 BY JACKSON, MOTION TO ADOPT (#562)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 50
- Absent: 14
May 28, 2015: House Vote on HB 2, AMENDMENT # 3875 BY WILLIAMS, A., MOTION TO ADOPT (#559)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 49
- Absent: 21
May 28, 2015: House Vote on HB 2, FINAL PASSAGE (#563)
- Yeas: 100
- Absent: 5
May 28, 2015: House Vote on HB 2, AMENDMENT # 3876 BY BURRELL, MOTION TO ADOPT (#561)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 57
- Absent: 22
May 28, 2015: House Vote on HB 2, AMENDMENT # 3802 BY BURRELL, MOTION TO ADOPT (#560)
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 44
- Absent: 14
May 28, 2015: House Vote on HB 2, AMENDMENT # 3876 BY BURRELL, MOTION TO ADOPT (#561)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 56
- Absent: 23
May 28, 2015: House Vote on HB 2, AMENDMENT # 3932 BY JACKSON, MOTION TO ADOPT (#562)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 50
- Absent: 16
May 28, 2015: House Vote on HB 2, FINAL PASSAGE (#563)
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor