+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date: 05/23/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 424.
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 05/14/18.
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/02/18.
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (10-0).
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 14, 2018: House Vote on HB 198, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1056)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 9
May 7, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 198, FINAL PASSAGE (#758)
- Yeas: 32
- Absent: 7
April 2, 2018: House Vote on HB 198, FINAL PASSAGE (#206)
- Yeas: 89
- Absent: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor