+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date: 01/01/2019.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 454.
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 05/15/18.
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/18.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
- Called from the calendar.
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (8-0).
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 15, 2018: House Vote on HB 189, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1134)
- Yeas: 87
- Absent: 17
May 9, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 189, AMENDMENT # 3838 BY DONAHUE, HB 189 BY WRIGHT (#942)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
April 10, 2018: House Vote on HB 189, FINAL PASSAGE (#341)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor