+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
- Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/19.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (10-0).
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Vote
April 29, 2019: House Vote on HB 188, FINAL PASSAGE (#87)
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor