+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2021.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 277.
On June 11, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Beaullieu, Gregory Miller, and Illg.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Committee report received.
- Rules suspended.
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 104, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Peacock, Robert Mills, and Harris.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 06/01/2021.
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2021.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
- Called from the calendar.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/22/2021.
- Notice given.
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/21/2021.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (9-0-1).
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On March 26, 2021 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
June 10, 2021: Senate Vote on HB 188, ADOPT (#1062)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 2
June 9, 2021: House Vote on HB 188, ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1199)
- Yeas: 104
- Absent: 1
June 1, 2021: House Vote on HB 188, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#874)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 10
May 20, 2021: Senate Vote on HB 188, FINAL PASSAGE (#425)
- Yeas: 38
April 26, 2021: House Vote on HB 188, FINAL PASSAGE (#73)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor