+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 5, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 377.
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 23 yeas and 12 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Called from the calendar.
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 53, nays 36. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/2016.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (12-0).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 187, FINAL PASSAGE (#947)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 4
April 18, 2016: House Vote on HB 187, FINAL PASSAGE (#349)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 36
- Absent: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor