+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Notice removed
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/17.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably (8-4).
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor