+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date: 06/30/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 286.
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2016.
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2016.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (17-0).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/26/2016.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 18, 2016: House Vote on HB 181, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#867)
- Yeas: 88
- Absent: 16
May 12, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 181, FINAL PASSAGE (#755)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
April 26, 2016: House Vote on HB 181, FINAL PASSAGE (#488)
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor