+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 23, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 814.
- Effective date: June 23, 2014.
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/3/2014.
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 1, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 84, nays 3. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2014.
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report received.
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Dorsey-Colomb, Broome, and White.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
- House conferees appointed: James, Badon, and Woodruff.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2014.
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/24/2014.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably (15-0).
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/21/2014.
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
June 2, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 173, ADOPT (#1722)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
June 1, 2014: House Vote on HB 173, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1572)
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 17
May 12, 2014: House Vote on HB 173, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#822)
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 13
April 30, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 173, FINAL PASSAGE (#619)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
March 24, 2014: House Vote on HB 173, FINAL PASSAGE (#71)
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor