+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 20. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2016.
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (8-3).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/26/2016.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 17, 2016: House Vote on HB 165, FINAL PASSAGE (#843)
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 18
May 17, 2016: House Vote on HB 165, FINAL PASSAGE (#843)
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor