+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 677.
- Effective date: 08/01/2018.
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
- Conference Committee report received.
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Claitor, Martiny, and Luneau.
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
- House conferees appointed: Mack, Hazel, and Hodges.
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 05/09/18.
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/02/18.
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (15-0).
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (5)
May 18, 2018: House Vote on HB 165, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1393)
- Yeas: 90
- Absent: 14
May 18, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 165, ADOPT (#1382)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
May 9, 2018: House Vote on HB 165, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#850)
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 6
May 1, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 165, FINAL PASSAGE (#688)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
April 2, 2018: House Vote on HB 165, FINAL PASSAGE (#204)
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 16
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor