+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 5. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/23/2016.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably (14-0).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/26/2016.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
- Prefiled.
+ − Vote
March 23, 2016: House Vote on HB 164, FINAL PASSAGE (#27)
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor