+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 64.
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/20/18.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (11-0).
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 25, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 151, FINAL PASSAGE (#527)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
March 20, 2018: House Vote on HB 151, FINAL PASSAGE (#54)
- Yeas: 88
- Absent: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor