+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 59, nays 37. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably (19-0).
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Prefiled.
+ − Vote
May 20, 2019: House Vote on HB 147, FINAL PASSAGE (#427)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 37
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor