+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 127.
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/23/2016.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably (13-0).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/26/2016.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
- Prefiled.
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 133, FINAL PASSAGE (#598)
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 6
March 23, 2016: House Vote on HB 133, FINAL PASSAGE (#26)
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor