+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 9, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: June 9, 2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 545.
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/24/2014.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably (15-0).
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/7/2014.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 132, AMENDMENT # BY , FINAL PASSAGE (#1311)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
March 24, 2014: House Vote on HB 132, FINAL PASSAGE (#69)
- Yeas: 85
- Absent: 20
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor