+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 678.
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2014.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2014.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 19, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2014.
- Rules suspended.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 312 reported by the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment (14-0).
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
June 1, 2014: House Vote on HB 1284, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1570)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 8
May 29, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 1284, FINAL PASSAGE (#1565)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
May 29, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 1284, CO-AUTHORS (#1566)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 19
May 20, 2014: House Vote on HB 1284, FINAL PASSAGE (#1077)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (63)
Type:
Primary Sponsor