+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 9, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 569.
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2014.
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 9. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/21/2014.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 727 reported by the Committee on Health and Welfare (14-0).
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2014: House Vote on HB 1262, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1369)
- Yeas: 87
- Absent: 17
May 27, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 1262, FINAL PASSAGE (#1427)
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 5
April 21, 2014: House Vote on HB 1262, FINAL PASSAGE (#494)
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 14
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor