+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2015.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 97.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/11/2015.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably (16-0).
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/20/2015.
- Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date.
+ − Votes (2)
May 27, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 126, FINAL PASSAGE (#561)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
May 11, 2015: House Vote on HB 126, FINAL PASSAGE (#281)
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor