+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 19, 2014 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 57, nays 26. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2014.
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably (17-0).
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 682 reported by the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice (14-0), ordered engrossed, to be recommitted to the Commitee on Appropriations.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 1255, FINAL PASSAGE (#1614)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 4
May 12, 2014: House Vote on HB 1255, FINAL PASSAGE (#847)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 26
- Absent: 21