+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date: 01/01/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 425.
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 82, nays 5, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2016.
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
- Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 77, nays 14. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2016.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (11-0).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/19/2016.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2016: House Vote on HB 123, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1085)
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 18
May 19, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 123, FINAL PASSAGE (#884)
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 6
April 26, 2016: House Vote on HB 123, FINAL PASSAGE (#487)
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 13