+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/2014.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably (16-0).
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 16, 2014: House Vote on HB 1223, FINAL PASSAGE (#486)
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor