+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/2014.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
- Reported favorably (15-3).
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2014: House Vote on HB 1215, FINAL PASSAGE (#604)
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 13
April 24, 2014: House Vote on HB 1215, FINAL PASSAGE (#604)
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor