+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: See Act.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 436.
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2014.
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (15-0).
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
May 29, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 1199, FINAL PASSAGE (#1553)
- Yeas: 39
April 28, 2014: House Vote on HB 1199, FINAL PASSAGE (#628)
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 13
April 28, 2014: House Vote on HB 1199, FINAL PASSAGE (#628)
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 12
April 28, 2014: House Vote on HB 1199, FINAL PASSAGE (#628)
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor