+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (4)
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 41, nays 50. Failed to pass.
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2016.
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 1101 reported by the Committee on Education (7-4).
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
May 17, 2016: House Vote on HB 1167, AMENDMENT # 4553 BY POPE, MOTION TO ADOPT (#846)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 45
- Absent: 15
May 17, 2016: House Vote on HB 1167, FINAL PASSAGE (#847)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 49
- Absent: 14
May 17, 2016: House Vote on HB 1167, FINAL PASSAGE (#847)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 50
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor