+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
- Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2014.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably (10-2).
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2014: House Vote on HB 1164, CALL FROM THE CALENDAR (#1523)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 58
- Absent: 11
May 13, 2014: House Vote on HB 1164, AMENDMENT # 5090 BY CONNICK, MOTION TO ADOPT (#883)
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 30
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor