+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 271.
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/2014.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
- Reported favorably (11-0).
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title.
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 1157, FINAL PASSAGE (#949)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
April 24, 2014: House Vote on HB 1157, FINAL PASSAGE (#597)
- Yeas: 83
- Absent: 22
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor