+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date: 01/01/2017.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 573.
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2016.
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2016.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 849 reported by the Committee on Insurance (10-0).
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (3)
June 2, 2016: House Vote on HB 1151, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1192)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
May 24, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 1151, FINAL PASSAGE (#999)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
May 5, 2016: House Vote on HB 1151, FINAL PASSAGE (#638)
- Yeas: 86
- Absent: 18
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor