+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date: 07/01/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 572.
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 5, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 102, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
- Called from the Calendar.
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2016.
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 682 reported by the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works (15-0).
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
June 3, 2016: House Vote on HB 1149, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1274)
- Yeas: 102
- Absent: 3
May 31, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 1149, FINAL PASSAGE (#1167)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
May 3, 2016: House Vote on HB 1149, FINAL PASSAGE (#593)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor