+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/17.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 72.
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/17.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (11-0).
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/24/2017.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 25, 2017: Senate Vote on HB 111, FINAL PASSAGE (#496)
- Yeas: 32
- Absent: 6
May 2, 2017: House Vote on HB 111, FINAL PASSAGE (#135)
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 5