+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 669.
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/06/2014.
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (12-0).
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 1107, FINAL PASSAGE (#1350)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
May 6, 2014: House Vote on HB 1107, FINAL PASSAGE (#736)
- Yeas: 87
- Absent: 17
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor