+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Involuntarily deferred in committee.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/15/2013.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
- Prefiled.