+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor.
- Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 16. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/19.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (13-0-1).
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/22/2019.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2019: Senate Vote on HB 11, FINAL PASSAGE (#334)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
April 30, 2019: House Vote on HB 11, FINAL PASSAGE (#97)
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor