+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 22.
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/09/2014.
- Notice given.
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/24/2014.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably (13-0).
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/10/2014.
On January 6, 2014 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Prefiled.
+ − Votes (3)
May 8, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 11, CO-AUTHORS (#800)
- Yeas: 30
- Absent: 9
May 8, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 11, FINAL PASSAGE (#801)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
April 9, 2014: House Vote on HB 11, FINAL PASSAGE (#362)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (109)
Type:
Primary Sponsor