+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2015.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 292.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 7, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/11/2015.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (14-0).
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/20/2015.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 109, FINAL PASSAGE (#755)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
May 11, 2015: House Vote on HB 109, FINAL PASSAGE (#279)
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor