+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 5, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 536.
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2014.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2014.
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably (13-0).
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 28, 2014: House Vote on HB 1087, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1295)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 7
May 22, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 1087, FINAL PASSAGE (#1345)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
April 28, 2014: House Vote on HB 1087, FINAL PASSAGE (#639)
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor